Patel, Naresh Raghunath (CPSO#: 90130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 May 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:Baroda University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 760
22 Mill Street West
Tilbury ON  N0P 2L0
Phone: (519) 682-2307
Fax: (519) 682-9979
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.R. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Patel ( CPSO# 90130 )

Business Address:
22 Mill Street West
P.O BOX 760
Tilbury ON  N0P 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 682-2307

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 03 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 03 May 2013 Active View Details [+]

            As from May 3, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Naresh Raghunath
            Patel, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Patel to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Naresh Raghunath Patel may not engage in the practice of hyperbaric
                  medicine.