Patel, Neeta (CPSO#: 75554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 221-7865
Fax: (416) 221-7024
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bridlewood Medical Clinic
Unit 241
2900 Warden Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 497-7277
Fax: (416) 497-7276
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Children's Afterhours Clinic
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
suite 100
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Canada
Phone: (416) 250-5000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Crescent Town Medical
Specialist Centre
4 The Market Place
East York ON  M4C 5M1
Canada
Phone: (416) 690-1357
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maharaj Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Patel ( CPSO# 75554 )
Dr. A. Maharaj ( CPSO# 67100 )

Business Address:
1144 Wilson Street West
Suite 205
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9

Business Address:
790 Bay Street
Suite 320
Toronto ON  M5N 1N8

Business Address:
2900 Warden Avenue
Suite 241
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S8

Business Address:
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 100
North York ON  M2K 2W1

Business Address:
4 The Market Place
East York ON  M4C 5M1

Business Address:
2900 Warden Avenue
Suite 241
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S8

Business Address:
45 Hannover Drive
Unit 4
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A3

Business Address:
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Unit 207
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2

Business Address:
10886 Hurontario Street
Suite A-7
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 495-5200

Business Address:
300 - 5734 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501

Business Address:
Suite 405
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 221-7865

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEETA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2000
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2001