Patel, Rikin Kirankumar (CPSO#: 94781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7013
Fax: 416-281-7102
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Kids Clinic
Unit 306
6633 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7C2
Canada
Phone: 289-554-1762
Fax: 289-554-1765
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rikin Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Patel ( CPSO# 94781 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RIKIN KIRANKUMAR PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2011 to 06 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 28 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2015