Patel, Serina Vinod (CPSO#: 85756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Road East
P.O. Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8494
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Srinidhi Jayaram and Serina Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patel ( CPSO# 85756 )
Dr. S. Jayaram ( CPSO# 88219 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 822-4521

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SERINA VINOD PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2006 to 15 Dec 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 22 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2014