Patel, Yatri Kiritkumar (CPSO#: 93597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Health Services
Algonquin College
1385 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K2G 1V8
Phone: 6137274723 Ext. 7222
Fax: 6137273166
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YATRI KIRITKUMAR PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015