Paterson, Nicole Dianne (CPSO#: 95021)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Centre for Fertility and Reproductive Health Suite 700 250 Dundas Street West Toronto, Ontario, Canada M5T 2Z5
Date Received: 02 Dec 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Oncology Effective: 30 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 May 2011 to 03 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Dec 2014