Patkar, Shabari (CPSO#: 85179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
mediclinic city hospital
P O Box 505004
Dubai
UAE
dubai 505004
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +97144359999
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shabari Patkar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 15 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHABARI PATKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009