Patmanidis, Anastasia (CPSO#: 103978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANASTASIA PATMANIDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATMANIDIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2018