Patrick, Lawrence Thomas (CPSO#: 27977)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lawrence Patrick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Command Services Ltd. 100 Piccadilly St London ON N6A 1R8 Telephone: 519-672-1460
Date Received: 03 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018