Patrie, Melanie Florence (CPSO#: 106400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3400 Hwy 144
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0
Phone: (705) 855-1018
Fax: 7058559007
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patrie ( CPSO# 106400)

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Phone Number: (705) 675-4883

Business Address:
3400 Highway 144
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 855-1018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE FLORENCE PATRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATRIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 19 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2017