Patsios, Demetris Andrea (CPSO#: 80240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Jul 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Oxford University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Peter Munk Building 1-284
200 Elizabeth street
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 3404800 Ext. 3790
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 946 4545
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416 586 4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 3494800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416 603 2581
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Demetris Patsios Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Patsios ( CPSO# 80240 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
52 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
38 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3M4
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 21 Jul 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 12 Dec 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Demetris  Andrea Patsios may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology, only.