Patterson, Bruce Jennings (CPSO#: 51658)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bruce J. Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Patterson ( CPSO# 51658 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018