Patterson, Christopher James (CPSO#: 26179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
St Peter's Hospital Site
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 12360
Fax: (905) 526-2062
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169, Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M5J5
Canada
Phone: 905-945-2253 Ext. 409
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Grandview Lodge
657 Lock Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 1V9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Blind River District Health Centre
525 Causley
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Manitoulin Health Centre
11, Meredith Street
Little Current ON  P0P1K0
Canada
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

Espanola Regional Hospital and HC
825 McKinnon
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Smithville Family Health Team
230 canborough Street
Smithville ON  L0R 2A0
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

McMaster Family Practice & SFHC
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Patterson ( CPSO# 26179 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
St. Peter's Hospital Site
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
North Shore Health Network Blind River
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1973