Patterson, Judy Louise (CPSO#: 64349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: Grant, Judy Louise Patterson (used until: 29 May 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAF Health Svcs Gp HQ
101 Colonel By Dr. - Carling Campus
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: 613 901 9491
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

99 Kakulu Rd.
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Canada
Phone: (613) 592-1448
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Judy L. Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 64349 )

Business Address:
60 Moodie Drive
Nepean ON  K2H 8G1
Phone Number: (613) 864-2769

Business Address:
Box 302
3 Anne Street
Pickle Lake ON  P0V 3A0
Phone Number: (613) 864-2769

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDY LOUISE PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2006