Paul, Baldeep Kaur (CPSO#: 95428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Baldeep Kaur Paul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Paul ( CPSO# 95428 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
Suite 4
55 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone Number: (705) 324-6763

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BALDEEP KAUR PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013