Paul, Niranjan Chandra (CPSO#: 80173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Patrice Lumumba People's Friendship Univ, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
White Cross Healthcare
647 Broadway Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R3C 0X2
Phone: (204) 786-8588

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIRANJAN CHANDRA PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2003 to 11 Nov 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2014