Paulsen, Tennille Dawn Shelley (CPSO#: 83031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: Shelley, Tennille Dawn (used until: 25 Jul 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tennille Dawn Shelley Paulsen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Paulsen ( CPSO# 83031 )

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Aug 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TENNILLE DAWN SHELLEY PAULSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAULSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007