Paupst, Elizabeth Ann (CPSO#: 83367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Brown University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
White Pines
#250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone: (705) 264-9151
Fax: (705) 268-7444
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Paupst Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Paupst ( CPSO# 83367 )

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
White Pines
250 - 123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone Number: (705) 264-9151

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN PAUPST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUPST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2007