Pavamani, Simon Pradeep (CPSO#: 85762)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Madras, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2006 to 24 Jan 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008