Pawa, Jasmine (CPSO#: 97770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o The Station
401 Richmond St. W
Suite LL01
Toronto ON  M5V 3A8
Phone: 647-874-2824
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASMINE PAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014