Paylor, Dascha Lynelle (CPSO#: 59508)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Student Health Services Room 11, University Community Centre University of Western Ontario 1151 Richmond Street London, ON N6A 3K7 Phone: (519)-661-3030 Fax: (519)-661-3380
Date Received: 20 Feb 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018