Payne, Darrin Marshall (CPSO#: 79060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Cardiac Surgery
76 Stuart Street Victory 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 2422
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darrin Payne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Payne ( CPSO# 79060 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Cardiac Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARRIN MARSHALL PAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2009