Peddle, Michael Bernard (CPSO#: 79313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
Box 5010
800 Comminsioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76538
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ornge
5310 Explorer Dr
Mississauga ON  L4W5H8
Canada
Phone: 226-377-9547
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Peddle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Peddle ( CPSO# 79313 )

Business Address:
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8
Phone Number: (226) 377-9547

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 663-3200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BERNARD PEDDLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEDDLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2008