Peddle, Ronald Cecil (CPSO#: 54054)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald C. Peddle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Streetsville Medical Centre 8-5425 Creditview Rd Mississauga, ON L5V 2P3
Date Received: 17 Apr 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018