Pedersen, Jan Bech (CPSO#: 96883)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Aarhus University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2011 to 21 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2011