Pedersen, Mary Elizabeth (CPSO#: 92673)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011