Pedersen, Sven Alexander (CPSO#: 68549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diamond Pedersen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Diamond ( CPSO# 66884 )
Dr. S. Pedersen ( CPSO# 68549 )

Business Address:
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-3021

Business Address:
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SVEN ALEXANDER PEDERSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEDERSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995