Pederson, Karla Jayne (CPSO#: 75164)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008