Pederson, Kristen Lue (CPSO#: 76547)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 20 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2017