Peer, Ismail Goolam Hoosen (CPSO#: 24494)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 135 - 2224 Walker Road Windsor ON N8W 5L7 Tel: 519-258-2261
Date Received: 18 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018