Peerani, Raheem (CPSO#: 98104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
4001 Leslie St
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHEEM PEERANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEERANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2018