Peeva, Valentina Kosta (CPSO#: 89857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Macedonian, Serbian

Education:ST CYRIL AND METHODIUS UNIVERSITY, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Ext. 6539
Fax: (807) 684-5894
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peeva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Peeva ( CPSO# 89857 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6139

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Macedonia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2008 to 02 Dec 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Valentina Kosta Peeva may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Dean, Clinical Sciences
                        Division, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. Peeva
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Peeva  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Peeva's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Peeva's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2013.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2020.