Pegu, Satyaranjan (CPSO#: 94297)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dibrugarh University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 06 Aug 2010 to 06 Oct 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013