Pek, Elisabeth Anna (CPSO#: 101115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Rm 1E452 - 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISABETH ANNA PEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2018