Pelchovitz, Jeffrey Ian (CPSO#: 95409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Forest Hill Family Health Centre
491 Eglinton Avenue West
2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: 416-782-6111 Ext. 119
Fax: 416-782-5515
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Harbourfront Medical
4-8 York Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Canada
Phone: 416-366-2273
Fax: 416-366-5665
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Pelchovitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pelchovitz ( CPSO# 95409 )

Business Address:
8 York Street
Suite 4
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone Number: (416) 366-2273

Business Address:
491 Eglinton Avenue West
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 782-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY IAN PELCHOVITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELCHOVITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013