Pell, Tripler (CPSO#: 84827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Brown University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Clair Medical Centre
50 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON M4T 1M9
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: 416 9211066
Fax: 4169218459
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Mar 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRIPLER PELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009