Pelletier, Jean-Sebastien (CPSO#: 92260)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 2009 to 13 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2012 to 22 Jul 2012
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 2012