Pellizzari, Michael Paul (CPSO#: 90270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 430-3087
Fax: (519) 804-4887
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Pellizzari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pellizzari ( CPSO# 90270 )

Business Address:
444 Douro Street
2nd Floor
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 430-3087

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 430-3087

Business Address:
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 430-3087

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PAUL PELLIZZARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELLIZZARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 31 May 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jun 2009 to 07 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 08 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011