Pelly, Lorine Patricia (CPSO#: 94687)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 04 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2013 to 16 Oct 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2013