Pema, Kesang (CPSO#: 95419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Lady Hardinge Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 Francis Street East
Fenelon Falls ON  K0M 1N0
Phone: (705) 887-4779
Fax: (705) 887-9499
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Pema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pema ( CPSO# 95419 )

Business Address:
205 Francis Street East
Box 849
Fenelon Falls ON  K0M 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 887-4779

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KESANG PEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013