Pencharz, James Nathan Onslow (CPSO#: 86648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Fax: (905) 813-3813
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pencharz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pencharz ( CPSO# 86648 )

Business Address:
105 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 813-3850

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES NATHAN ONSLOW PENCHARZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENCHARZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009