Pennal, Alexandra Grace Mary (CPSO#: 93021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8185
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA GRACE MARY PENNAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENNAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018