Penner, Melanie Jane (CPSO#: 88623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Bloorview
Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
Room 2W605
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220 Ext. 6343
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Developmental Paediatrics Effective: 29 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE JANE PENNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014