Peoples, Brian (CPSO#: 25251)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Sep 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Peoples Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 23 2017

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients may submit a request for their medical records to RSRS at 1-888-563-3732 or by visiting www.recordsolutions.ca/drpeoples
Date Received: 21 Sep 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Sep 2018

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Jun 1991
Summary:

 In June 1991, Dr. Peoples pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within a reasonable 
 time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in 
 respect of an examination or treatment performed by him.  The Discipline Committee accepted this 
 plea and found Dr. Peoples guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered 
 that Dr. Peoples be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register; 
 that he be fined $3000.00; and that, should the Doctor fail to pay the fine and/or fail to present 
 himself for the reprimand within sixty days of the Order becoming final, his licence to practice 
 would be suspended until the terms were satisfied.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 13 Jun 1991

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 4, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brian Peoples to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 4, 2018:

College investigations were conducted into Dr. Peoples’ general medicine practice. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Peoples resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)