Pepelassis, Dionissios (CPSO#: 75902)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008