Pepper, Erin Rachel (CPSO#: 82421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
1060 Burnham Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 5V8
Phone: (905) 373-8333
Fax: (905) 373-9333
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Dr
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 372-6811
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erin Pepper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pepper ( CPSO# 82421 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
1060 Burnham Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 5V9
Phone Number: (905) 372-9921

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN RACHEL PEPPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEPPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007