Peralta, Crystal Grace (CPSO#: 111319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  02 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Castlemoore Family Medical Centre
Suite 2
9960 Airport Road
Brampton ON  L6S 0C5
Phone: (905) 799-2273
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Crystal Peralta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Peralta ( CPSO# 111319)

Business Address:
Castlemoore Family Medical Centre
Suite 2
9960 Airport Road
Brampton ON  M6S 0C5
Phone Number: (905) 799-2273

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jan 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 02 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Crystal  Grace  Peralta may practise family medicine with Castlemore
                  Family  Medical Clinic,  located  at  9960  Airport  Road,  in  Brampton,
                  Ontario,  while  under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable
                  to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires on January 2, 2019.

            3.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration  Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the  College  of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Peralta's knowledge, skill, judgment or  attitude, does not provide
                        the  required reports to the College by the  due  date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Peralta's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the  College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Peralta's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate  is  issued  on  January  3, 2017, and will expire on or
                  before January 2, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.