Percival, Timothy Alan (CPSO#: 84693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Callander Lakeside Medical Clinic
299 Main Street North
Callander ON  P0H 1H0
Phone: (705) 752-1004
Fax: (705) 752-4507
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 2506
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Percival Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Percival ( CPSO# 84693 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
Callander Lakeside Medical Clinic
299 Main Street
Callander ON  P0H 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 752-1004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY ALAN PERCIVAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERCIVAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008