Peregoudov, Serguei (CPSO#: 80507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Chelyabinsk State Medical Academy, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4500 Ext. 5407
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Peregoudov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Peregoudov ( CPSO# 80507 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4500

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-4325

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SERGUEI PEREGOUDOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREGOUDOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 30 Apr 2004
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004