Pereira, Felipe Andrade (CPSO#: 90993)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 27 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 27 Jul 2011 to 26 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 27 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2016